Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 07/31/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/04/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/06/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/20/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/25/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/03/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/31/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/05/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/05/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 01/15/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 01/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 01/15/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/14/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/16/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/29/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/29/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/30/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/05/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/05/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/13/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/15/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/19/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/03/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/09/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/11/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/08/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/09/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/21/2008
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 07/22/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/29/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 11/20/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/20/2008