Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/12/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/12/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/12/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 01/12/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/12/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 01/12/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/12/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/12/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/12/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 01/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 01/18/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/18/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/18/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/24/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/24/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/24/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/06/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/06/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/14/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/28/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/28/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/28/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/12/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/12/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/12/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/19/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 03/19/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 03/19/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/20/2007