Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/15/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/18/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/09/2008