Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/06/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/10/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/10/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/14/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/18/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/18/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/18/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/19/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/20/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/25/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/10/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/15/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 11/05/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 11/15/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/15/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/05/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/10/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/10/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 12/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/16/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/28/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 01/28/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/01/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 04/08/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 04/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/16/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/01/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/15/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/24/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/30/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 09/29/2008