Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/04/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/27/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/27/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/06/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/11/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/22/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/22/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/23/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 04/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/07/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/09/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/09/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/10/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/10/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cazayoux, Donald J., Jr. [D-LA-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/12/2008
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 06/12/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 06/12/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/12/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/12/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/12/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/12/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/12/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/12/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 06/12/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/12/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 06/12/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/12/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/18/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/18/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/18/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/18/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/19/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/19/2008
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/19/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/19/2008
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 06/19/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/23/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/24/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/24/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/24/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2008