Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 08/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/01/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/05/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/04/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/05/2008