Refine your search

7 results for Actions Overview
Date Actions Overview
12/18/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-139. (TXT | PDF)
12/18/2007 Signed by President.
12/11/2007 Presented to President.
12/06/2007 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S15000)
11/13/2007 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 398 - 6 (Roll no. 1082).(text: CR H13529)
11/08/2007 Reported by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-436.
08/02/2007 Introduced in House