Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 01/17/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/17/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/17/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 01/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 01/31/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/31/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/31/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 02/16/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 02/16/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 06/15/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/15/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/17/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/23/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/18/2008