Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 08/02/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 08/02/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 08/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/10/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/26/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/26/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/22/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/22/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/22/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/22/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 10/23/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/25/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/29/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/31/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/06/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/04/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/04/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/16/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 01/22/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/22/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/07/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/07/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/07/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/14/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/24/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/01/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/08/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/08/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/08/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/08/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/08/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/08/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/08/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/08/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/08/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/08/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/08/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/08/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/09/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/09/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/09/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/09/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/10/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 09/10/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/10/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/10/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/11/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 09/11/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/11/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/11/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 09/11/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/15/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/15/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/15/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/16/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/16/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/16/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/16/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/16/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/17/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/17/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/17/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/17/2008
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/23/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/23/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/23/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/26/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/26/2008