There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Federal Dog Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend the Animal Welfare Act to prohibit dog fighting ventures.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
08/02/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
04/25/2008Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
09/10/2007Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
08/02/2007Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/2007Referred to House Agriculture
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/2007Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
08/02/2007Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (107)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/05/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/29/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/29/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 06/17/2008

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Agriculture08/02/2007 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Livestock, Dairy, and Poultry04/25/2008 Referred to
House Judiciary08/02/2007 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security09/10/2007 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.3327.


Subjects (13)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3327. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (08/02/2007)

Federal Dog Protection Act - Amends the Animal Welfare Act to make it unlawful to knowingly: (1) sponsor or exhibit an animal in, or knowingly attend, a dog fighting venture; (2) sell, buy, possess, train, transport, deliver, or receive for purposes of transportation any dog or other animal for the purpose of having the dog or other animal, or offspring of the dog or other animal, participate in a dog fighting venture; or (3) use the U.S. mail service or any instrumentality of interstate commerce for commercial speech that promotes or furthers such prohibited actions.

Makes costs incurred for the care of animals seized and forfeited recoverable from the owner (currently recoverable costs are limited to those incurred by the United States).

Allows animal control agencies, humane societies, or societies for the prevention of cruelty to animals to commence a civil suit to enjoin any private party who is alleged to be in violation of provisions concerning animal fighting. Provides for enforcement.