Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/05/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/05/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/06/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/20/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/20/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/20/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/27/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/02/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/02/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/02/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/03/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/04/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/09/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/10/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/15/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/15/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/17/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/22/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 10/29/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/29/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 11/07/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 12/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 12/18/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/16/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/16/2008
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 06/17/2008