Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 08/03/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 08/03/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 08/03/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/17/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/18/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/01/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/08/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/08/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/08/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 11/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 11/13/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/05/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 12/11/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/13/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 12/13/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/22/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 01/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/22/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/23/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 01/23/2008
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/06/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/13/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/15/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/20/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/22/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/12/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/26/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 07/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/09/2008