Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/29/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 01/29/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/31/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/31/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/05/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 03/21/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/21/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/18/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/18/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/18/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/02/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/02/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/10/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 05/10/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/10/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/10/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/24/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/24/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/11/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 11/09/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 12/18/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/06/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/12/2008
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/12/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/25/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/25/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/10/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/31/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/03/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/03/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/03/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/10/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/10/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/10/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/16/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/16/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/30/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/03/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/15/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 07/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/17/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/22/2008
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/28/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/28/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 07/28/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 07/28/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/31/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/18/2008