Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/05/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/31/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/06/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/22/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 06/05/2008