Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 08/03/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/10/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/10/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/24/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/05/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/07/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 12/05/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/05/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 12/06/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 01/15/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/22/2008