Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 08/02/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/02/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 08/03/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/05/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/14/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/05/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/16/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/16/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/22/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/29/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/11/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/08/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/29/2008