Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 08/02/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/15/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/15/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/14/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/17/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/17/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/2008