Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/04/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 09/04/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/04/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/04/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 09/04/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/04/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/04/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/04/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/04/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/04/2007
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/06/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 09/10/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/31/2007