Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/19/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/26/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/10/2007