Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-89 (09/28/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on September 25, 2007. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Trade Act of 1974 to extend from September 30, 2007, through December 31, 2007, the authorization of appropriations for the trade adjustment assistance program for workers, firms (including agricultural firms), and farmers.

Amends the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation Act of 2005 to increase the amount of any corporate estimated tax installment otherwise due by a corporation with assets of not less than $1 billion in July, August, or September of 2012 to 115% of such amount.

Amends the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 to extend from September 30, 2014, through October 7, 2014, certain customs fees for the processing of merchandise entered into the United States.