Text: H.R.3375 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Bill Information (Except Text)

09/28/2007 Became Public Law No: 110-89

Bill text available as:

Shown Here:
Enrolled Bill (09/26/2007)


Formatting necessary for an accurate reading of this legislative text may be shown by tags (e.g., <DELETED> or <BOLD>) or may be missing from this TXT display. For complete and accurate display of this text, see the PDF or HTML/XML.




[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 3375 Enrolled Bill (ENR)]

        H.R.3375

                       One Hundred Tenth Congress

                                 of the

                        United States of America


                          AT THE FIRST SESSION

          Begun and held at the City of Washington on Thursday,
            the fourth day of January, two thousand and seven


                                 An Act


 
To extend the trade adjustment assistance program under the Trade Act of 
                           1974 for 3 months.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,
SECTION 1. TEMPORARY EXTENSION OF TRADE ADJUSTMENT ASSISTANCE PROGRAM.
    (a) Assistance for Workers.--Section 245(a) of the Trade Act of 
1974 (19 U.S.C. 2317(a)) is amended by striking ``September 30, 2007'' 
and inserting ``December 31, 2007''.
    (b) Assistance for Firms.--Section 256(b) of the Trade Act of 1974 
(19 U.S.C. 2346(b)) is amended by inserting after ``2007,'' the 
following: ``and $4,000,000 for the 3-month period beginning on October 
1, 2007,''.
    (c) Assistance for Farmers.--Section 298(a) of the Trade Act of 
1974 (19 U.S.C. 2401g(a)) is amended by inserting before the period the 
following: ``, and there are authorized to be appropriated and there 
are appropriated to the Department of Agriculture to carry out this 
chapter $9,000,000 for the 3-month period beginning on October 1, 
2007''.
    (d) Extension of Termination Dates.--Section 285 of the Trade Act 
of 1974 (19 U.S.C. 2271 note) is amended by striking ``September 30'' 
each place it appears and inserting ``December 31''.
    (e) Effective Date.--The amendments made by this section shall be 
effective as of October 1, 2007.
SEC. 2. OFFSETS.
    (a) Time for Payment of Corporate Estimated Taxes.--Subparagraph 
(B) of section 401(1) of the Tax Increase Prevention and Reconciliation 
Act of 2005 is amended by striking ``114.75 percent'' and inserting 
``115 percent''.
    (b) Customs User Fees.--Section 13031(j)(3)(B)(i) of the 
Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (19 U.S.C. 
58c(j)(3)(B)(i)) is amended by striking ``September 30, 2014'' and 
inserting ``October 7, 2014''.

                               Speaker of the House of Representatives.

                            Vice President of the United States and    
                                               President of the Senate.