Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 09/17/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/15/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/30/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 11/05/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/13/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/29/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/29/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 01/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/06/2008