Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/20/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/20/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/10/2008