Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/09/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/09/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/09/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/09/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/10/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/22/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/22/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/05/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/06/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/08/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/08/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 05/08/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/08/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/08/2008
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/08/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/12/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/12/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/12/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/12/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/12/2008
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/12/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/12/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/12/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 05/12/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 05/15/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/15/2008