Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/14/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/08/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/11/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 09/24/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/29/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/29/2008