Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/10/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 10/01/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/22/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 12/06/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 12/11/2007