Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/13/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/15/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/21/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/27/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 06/04/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 09/08/2008