Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/05/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/06/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/14/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/14/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/14/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/18/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/18/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/18/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/18/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/18/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 09/19/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/19/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 09/19/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/19/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/19/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/19/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/19/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 09/25/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/25/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 09/25/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 09/25/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 09/25/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/25/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 09/25/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/01/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/02/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2007