Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/10/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/17/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/26/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/26/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/04/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/04/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 01/17/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/17/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/06/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/06/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 02/06/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/06/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 02/14/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/14/2008
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/05/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/16/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 07/16/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/08/2008