Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/04/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 09/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/07/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/07/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 09/07/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/07/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 09/07/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/07/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/07/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/07/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 12/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/05/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/05/2008