Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 08/03/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 08/03/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 08/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 09/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 11/13/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/13/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 12/05/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/05/2007
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/17/2008