Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/03/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/22/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 10/22/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/29/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/29/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/31/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 11/14/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 12/12/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 12/12/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 12/12/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/12/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 12/12/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/12/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 12/19/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/15/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 02/13/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/13/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/13/2008
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/28/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/31/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/08/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/24/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/01/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/15/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/09/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/17/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/17/2008