Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/04/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/07/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/17/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/17/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/20/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/26/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/26/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/26/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 10/02/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/02/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/02/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 10/09/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/09/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/09/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/09/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/16/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 10/16/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/24/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 10/30/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 11/14/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/14/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 12/04/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 12/04/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 12/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 12/11/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/19/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 01/16/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/06/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/25/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 02/26/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/26/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/28/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/04/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/11/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/31/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/01/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/17/2008
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/24/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/13/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/13/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/13/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/15/2008
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/19/2008
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/19/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 05/20/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/22/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/22/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/03/2008
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/05/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/05/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/09/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/09/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/18/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/20/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/23/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/25/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 07/23/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 11/19/2008