Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 01/09/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 01/09/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/09/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/11/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 01/11/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/11/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/16/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/16/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 01/23/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/23/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/23/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/15/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/15/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/15/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/15/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/15/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/21/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/21/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/21/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/21/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/21/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/21/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/21/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/21/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/21/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/21/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/21/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/21/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/17/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/03/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/15/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/22/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/22/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/22/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/22/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/22/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/22/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/22/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/22/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/22/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/22/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/22/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/22/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 07/16/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/19/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/19/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/19/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 07/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/19/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/19/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/23/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/30/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 08/04/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 08/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 08/04/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 08/04/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 08/04/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/04/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 08/04/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 08/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 08/04/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 08/04/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 08/04/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 08/04/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 08/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 08/04/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 08/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 08/04/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 08/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 08/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2008