Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 08/04/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/04/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/04/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/10/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/18/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/23/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/23/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 10/25/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 10/25/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 10/25/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 10/25/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/31/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/31/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/31/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/31/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/01/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 11/13/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 11/13/2007