Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/06/2007
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/07/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/07/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/20/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/20/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/20/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/24/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/24/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/24/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/26/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/26/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/26/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/27/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/27/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/03/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/03/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 10/03/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/10/2007
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/10/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/10/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/18/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 10/18/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/18/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/18/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/18/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 10/25/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/25/2007
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 10/25/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/25/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/30/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/08/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/04/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/22/2008