Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/23/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/23/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/10/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/14/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/31/2008