Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 09/07/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/07/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/07/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 09/07/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/17/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 09/17/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/17/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/17/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/17/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 09/17/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/17/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 09/17/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/19/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 09/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/19/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/19/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/19/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 09/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/27/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/02/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 02/14/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/17/2008