There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Kids in Disasters Well-being, Safety, and Health Act of 2007

Short Titles as Reported to House

Kids in Disasters Well-being, Safety, and Health Act of 2007

Short Titles as Introduced

Kids in Disasters Well-being, Safety, and Health Act of 2007

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Titles as Amended by House

A bill to establish a National Commission on Children and Disasters, and for other purposes.

Official Title as Introduced

To establish a National Commission on Children and Disasters, a National Resource Center on Children and Disasters, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/06/2007Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 8 (Roll no. 1043).(text: CR H12778-12779)
11/05/2007Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-425.
09/07/2007Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
12/26/2007HouseFor Further Action See P.L. 110-161, Division G, Title VI, Sections 601 through 603 (H.R. 2764).
11/13/2007SenateRead the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 478.
11/08/2007SenateReceived in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time.
11/06/2007-6:33pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2007-6:32pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/06/2007-6:32pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 8 (Roll no. 1043). (text: CR H12778-12779)
11/06/2007-6:26pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H12799-12800)
11/06/2007-2:20pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/06/2007-2:04pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3495.
11/06/2007-2:04pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H12778-12782)
11/06/2007-2:04pmHouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/05/2007HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 267.
11/05/2007HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation. H. Rept. 110-425.
10/31/2007HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
10/31/2007HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
10/30/2007HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
10/30/2007HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management
09/10/2007HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/07/2007HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/07/2007HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1863)
09/07/2007HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/07/2007 Referred to
10/31/2007 Markup by
11/05/2007 Reported by H. Rept. 110-425
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management09/10/2007 Referred to
10/30/2007 Markup by
10/30/2007 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.3495. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (11/06/2007)

Kids in Disasters Well-being, Safety, and Health Act of 2007 - Establishes the National Commission on Children and Disasters, which shall: (1) conduct a comprehensive study that assesses childrens' needs as they relate to preparation for, response to, and recovery from all hazards, including major disasters and emergencies; (2) identify, review, and evaluate existing law relevant to such needs; (3) identify, review, and evaluate the lessons learned from past disasters relative to addressing such needs; and (4) report to the President and Congress on its findings and recommendations to address such needs, including regarding the need for a national resource center on children and disasters, coordination of resources and services, administrative actions, policies, regulations, financing, and legislative changes.

Sets forth provisions regarding the Commission's powers, staffing, reporting and record-keeping requirements, and termination. Authorizes appropriations.