Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/10/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 09/24/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/25/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/27/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 10/10/2007