Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/17/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/17/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 09/17/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/20/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/20/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/27/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/01/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/09/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/23/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/24/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/05/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/23/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/06/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/06/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/25/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/11/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/13/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/31/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/02/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/02/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/08/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/2008
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/14/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/14/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/14/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/24/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/24/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/24/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/29/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/29/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/30/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/30/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/30/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/05/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/05/2008
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/20/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/21/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/21/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/21/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 05/21/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/04/2008
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/04/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/12/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/17/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 07/30/2008