Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/17/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/04/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/25/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/06/2007