Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/24/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 09/24/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/24/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/03/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/10/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/10/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/17/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 10/17/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 10/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/17/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/17/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/17/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 10/17/2007
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 10/17/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/18/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/18/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/18/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 10/18/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 10/18/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 10/18/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/18/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/18/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 10/18/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/18/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 10/18/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 10/18/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 10/18/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 10/18/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/18/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 10/18/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 10/18/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 10/18/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/18/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/18/2007