Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/17/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/17/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/18/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/18/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/18/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/22/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/22/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 01/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 01/29/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 01/29/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 01/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/29/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 02/05/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/07/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/07/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 02/07/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/07/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/08/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 02/14/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 02/14/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 02/14/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/27/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/13/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/13/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/13/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/13/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/13/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/16/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/09/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/09/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/09/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/14/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/14/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/14/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/14/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/14/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 05/14/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 05/24/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/24/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 08/01/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 08/03/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/04/2007