Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 09/19/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/20/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 09/20/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 09/20/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/24/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/24/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 09/24/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/24/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/24/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/25/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/25/2007
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/25/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/01/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 10/01/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/01/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 10/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/05/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 10/05/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/15/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/17/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/18/2007