Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/24/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 09/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 09/25/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 09/25/2007
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/27/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/27/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/27/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/27/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/27/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/27/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/02/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/09/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/10/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/10/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/15/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/15/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/18/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 10/22/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/24/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/30/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 11/07/2007