Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/09/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 01/09/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/09/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/09/2007
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 01/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/11/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 01/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/12/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/19/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/24/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/07/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/05/2007
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/18/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/15/2007