Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 09/19/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/19/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 09/24/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 10/09/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 10/31/2007
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/04/2007