Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/20/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/25/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/25/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 09/25/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/25/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/26/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/27/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/27/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/27/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/04/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 10/10/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 10/10/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 10/10/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/10/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 10/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/15/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 10/15/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 10/15/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/15/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/17/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/25/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/29/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/06/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/06/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 11/06/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/14/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/14/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/14/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 12/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/04/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/12/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 12/12/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/12/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 12/12/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 12/12/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 12/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/19/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/19/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/19/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/16/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 01/29/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/07/2008
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/07/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/07/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/07/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/07/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 02/07/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/21/2008
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 02/21/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/21/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/21/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/28/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/28/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/28/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/05/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/11/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/13/2008
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/13/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/13/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/13/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/14/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/14/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/09/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/20/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 11/20/2008

Show cosponsors who withdrew