Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/10/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 01/24/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/24/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/29/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/29/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/29/2007
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/16/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/16/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/16/2007